This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:40:37 (UTC).

AMANDA BOKOBZHA VS LYFT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 AMANDA BOKOBZHA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYFT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2552

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOKOBZHA AMANDA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 102

KUCHER JOHN

LUFT INC.

LYFT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOLDSMAN GENE J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HARNEY CHRISTOPHER J.

ESCAREZ JOSEPH A.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/28/2018: DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/28/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S DEMAND

6/28/2018: DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S DEMAND

DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/28/2018: DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Substitution of Attorney

3/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Appearance

3/18/2019: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

3/18/2019: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service - No Service

3/18/2019: Proof of Service - No Service

SUMMONS

4/18/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

4/18/2018: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • Notice of Appearance; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Notice of Appearance; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Amanda Bokobzha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Amanda Bokobzha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Amanda Bokobzha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702552    Hearing Date: February 03, 2020    Dept: 29

Bokobzha v. Lyft, Inc. et al.

The Motion to Continue Trial and All Related Dates Filed by Defendant Lyft, Inc. is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 

Defendant Lyft has shown good cause only for a three-month continuance.  The Court thus continues the trial to 7/9/2020 at 8:30 a.m.  The final status conference is continued to 6/25/2020.  Discovery and motion cut off dates are calculated based on the new trial date. 

The trial date is firm.  The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses, including expert witnesses, of the new trial date immediately.  No further continuances should be expected.

The parties are to prepare diligently for trial, including the completion of expert discovery, even if the parties are hopeful that the case will settle at mediation or otherwise.  The Court will not grant further continuances based on the need to conduct further discovery if the parties do not diligently proceed with discovery. 

Moving party is ordered to give notice. 

Case Number: BC702552    Hearing Date: January 29, 2020    Dept: 29

Bokobzha v. Lyft, Inc. et al.

The Motion to Continue Trial and All Related Dates Filed by Defendant Lyft, Inc. is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.

Defendant Lyft has shown good cause only for a three-month continuance. The Court thus continues the trial to 7/9/2020 at 8:30 a.m. The final status conference is continued to 6/25/2020. Discovery and motion cut off dates are calculated based on the new trial date.

The trial date is firm. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses, including expert witnesses, of the new trial date immediately. No further continuances should be expected.

The parties are to prepare diligently for trial, including the completion of expert discovery, even if the parties are hopeful that the case will settle at mediation or otherwise. The Court will not grant further continuances based on the need to conduct further discovery if the parties do not diligently proceed with discovery.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.