This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 01:40:58 (UTC).

AMALYA SARGSYAN VS MIKAYEL STEPANOVICH SIMONYAN

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 AMALYA SARGSYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIKAYEL STEPANOVICH SIMONYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8988

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARGSYAN AMALYA

Defendant

SIMONYAN MIKAYEL STEPANOVICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KHACHATRIAN ARTHUR

SOGOYAN JACK

Defendant Attorney

WOODWARD LYN A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/6/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/6/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/6/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

10/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/9/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

12/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2024
  • Hearing09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2024
  • Hearing03/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2024
  • Hearing02/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Mikayel Stepanovich Simonyan (Defendant); As to: Amalya Sargsyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Mikayel Stepanovich Simonyan (Defendant); As to: Amalya Sargsyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mikayel Stepanovich Simonyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Amalya Sargsyan (Plaintiff); As to: Mikayel Stepanovich Simonyan (Defendant); Service Date: 10/22/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Amalya Sargsyan (Plaintiff); As to: Mikayel Stepanovich Simonyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Amalya Sargsyan (Plaintiff); As to: Mikayel Stepanovich Simonyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Amalya Sargsyan (Plaintiff); As to: Mikayel Stepanovich Simonyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less