This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 04:22:12 (UTC).

AMAL HABASHY, ET AL. VS LAS CASITAS OWNERS ASSOCIATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 AMAL HABASHY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LAS CASITAS OWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEIRDRE HILL and CARY NISHIMOTO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0667

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEIRDRE HILL

CARY NISHIMOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HABASHY MENA

HABASHY AMAL

Defendants

LAS CASITAS OWNERS ASSOCIATION

BALI MANAGEMENT GROUP INC

NATIONAL GENERAL LENDER SERVICES ADJUSTING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON AMANDA

Defendant Attorney

GEIBEL MICHAEL B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

5/10/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Status Conference Statement

9/30/2021: Status Conference Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Initial Status Conference Report

11/5/2021: Initial Status Conference Report

Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT RE SECOND POST- MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

11/8/2021: Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT RE SECOND POST- MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 11/08/2021

11/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 11/08/2021

Status Conference Statement - DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT RE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

9/27/2021: Status Conference Statement - DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT RE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

1/21/2021: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 01/21/2021

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 01/21/2021

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

1/7/2021: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Case Management Statement

1/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1/13/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • Hearing11/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Hearing07/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; Filed by Michael B. Geibel (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • Docketat 5:30 PM in Department M; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amal Habashy (Plaintiff); Mena Habashy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by Amal Habashy (Plaintiff); Mena Habashy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by Amal Habashy (Plaintiff); Mena Habashy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amal Habashy (Plaintiff); Mena Habashy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amal Habashy (Plaintiff); Mena Habashy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amal Habashy (Plaintiff); Mena Habashy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amal Habashy (Plaintiff); Mena Habashy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BALI MANAGEMENT GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL GENERAL LENDER SERVICES ADJUSTING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEIBEL MICHAEL B.