This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 03:25:42 (UTC).

AMAL GABRIEL VS SEAN EBRAHAMIAN, DDS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 AMAL GABRIEL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SEAN EBRAHAMIAN, DDS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0658

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GABRIEL AMAL

Defendants

EBRAHAMIAN SEAN DDS

IMPLANTS 4 LIFE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDBERG STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

WRIGHT DAVID M

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) OF 11/02/2022

11/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) OF 11/02/2022

Notice of Ruling

11/2/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

11/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

10/7/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

10/6/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

10/6/2022: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/9/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

8/17/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

8/24/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

6/30/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

6/30/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/15/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/2/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2024
  • Hearing05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2024
  • Hearing01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2024
  • Hearing01/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order to Be Relieved as Counsel - Civil: Filed By: AMAL GABRIEL (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: AMAL GABRIEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 11/02/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/02/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 11/02/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: AMAL GABRIEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/02/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMAL GABRIEL (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN EBRAHAMIAN, DDS (Defendant); IMPLANTS 4 LIFE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMAL GABRIEL (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN EBRAHAMIAN, DDS (Defendant); IMPLANTS 4 LIFE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMAL GABRIEL (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN EBRAHAMIAN, DDS (Defendant); IMPLANTS 4 LIFE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0658 Hearing Date: November 2, 2022 Dept: 29

Amal Gabriel v. Sean Ebrahamian, DDS, et al.

TENTATIVE

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Amal Gabriel, is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDBERG STEVEN