This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2022 at 08:38:09 (UTC).

AMAL ABDULLA, ET AL. VS ADRIAN BARBOSA

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 AMAL ABDULLA, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADRIAN BARBOSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3401

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABDULLA AMAL

NAAOM GHALIB

Defendant

BARBOSA ADRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOSHARIAN PETER ASHOT

Defendant Attorney

MOSKOVIAN ANY J.

 

Court Documents

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/30/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/30/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/30/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

11/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

11/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Motion to Continue Trial Date - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

10/24/2022: Motion to Continue Trial Date - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/24/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

10/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES

10/19/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/18/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/18/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/18/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/18/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/24/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/24/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/2/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

5/11/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2024
  • Hearing01/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • Hearing07/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Ghalib Naaom (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Amal Abdulla (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: Amal Abdulla (Plaintiff); As to: Amal Abdulla (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: Ghalib Naaom (Plaintiff); As to: Ghalib Naaom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Hearing on Motio...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 11/30/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 11/30/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Amal Abdulla (Plaintiff); Ghalib Naaom (Plaintiff); As to: Adrian Barbosa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Amal Abdulla (Plaintiff); Ghalib Naaom (Plaintiff); As to: Adrian Barbosa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Amal Abdulla (Plaintiff); Ghalib Naaom (Plaintiff); As to: Adrian Barbosa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******3401 Hearing Date: November 30, 2022 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

AMAL ABDULLA, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ADRIAN BARBOSA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: *******3401

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

November 30, 2022

Plaintiffs’ attorney of record, Peter A. Hosharian, Esq. (“Counsel”), moves to be relieved as counsel for each of Plaintiff Amal Abdulla (“Abdulla”) and Ghalib Naaom (“Naaom”) (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) asserting that irreconcilable differences have arisen between Counsel and Plaintiffs. Counsel declares he served the moving papers on Plaintiffs via mail at Plaintiffs’ last known address. Counsel has filed proof of service on Plaintiffs and on Defendant.

The motions are unopposed and granted; the ruling is effective upon filing proof of service of the final orders, containing the correct upcoming hearing and trial dates in the case, on Plaintiffs and Defendant. The Court notes the next scheduled matter is a Final Status Conference set for June 27, 2023, and trial is not scheduled until July 11, 2023. Therefore, there is sufficient time for Plaintiffs to seek other counsel or otherwise prepare for trial.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE:

Dated this 30th day of November 2022

Hon. Audra Mori

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: *******3401 Hearing Date: November 17, 2022 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

AMAL ABDULLA, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ADRIAN BARBOSA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: *******3401

[TENTATIVE] ORDER FINDING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE MOOT

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

November 17, 2022

Plaintiffs Amal Abdulla and Ghalib Naaom (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed the instant motion to continue to trial on October 24, 2022, seeking to continue the previous trial date of December 6, 2022, to June 12, 2023, or a date thereafter. The same date this motion was filed the Court signed and filed a stipulation by the parties continuing the trial date to July 11, 2023.

To date, no party has filed anything further pertaining to the motion to continue trial. Therefore, the Court presumes the motion is moot and takes it off calendar. The Court asks counsel to promptly take all matters off-calendar when they become moot.

Plaintiffs are ordered to give notice.

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE:

Dated this 17th day of November 2022

Hon. Audra Mori

Judge of the Superior Court