This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 05:08:53 (UTC).

AM TRUST NORTH AMERICA INC VS DOMINGO ESCOBAR

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 AM TRUST NORTH AMERICA INC filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DOMINGO ESCOBAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0846

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AM TRUST NORTH AMERICA INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

ESCOBAR DOMINGO

SMART & FINAL STORES INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MENDELSON GOLDMAN & SCHWARZ APC

MATTHIESEN WICKERT & LEHRER S.C.

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH KEVIN D

LEWIS TRACY M

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/5/2018: Minute Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/19/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order

11/14/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/11/2018: Answer

Minute Order

1/4/2019: Minute Order

Order

3/21/2019: Order

Stipulation and Order

3/21/2019: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

3/21/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/22/2019: Notice

Unknown

3/22/2019: Unknown

Answer

3/22/2019: Answer

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/3/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

COMPLAINT-WORKERS' COMPENSATION SUBROGATION

3/22/2017: COMPLAINT-WORKERS' COMPENSATION SUBROGATION

SUMMONS

3/22/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/31/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/15/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Order); Filed by Domingo Escobar (Defendant); Smart & Final Stores, Inc. (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Domingo Escobar (Defendant); Smart & Final Stores, Inc. (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Domingo Escobar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal for failure to enter default judgment as to Defendant Domingo Escobar / Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal for failure to enter def...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Stipulation And Order); Filed by Domingo Escobar (Defendant); Smart & Final Stores, Inc. (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Order (Proposed Order); Filed by Domingo Escobar (Defendant); Smart & Final Stores, Inc. (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Smart & Final Stores, Inc. (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Am Trust North America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Am Trust North America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • COMPLAINT-WORKERS' COMPENSATION SUBROGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Am Trust North America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC660846    Hearing Date: February 19, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

AM TRUST AMERICA, Inc.,

Plaintiff,

v.

DOMINGO ESCOBAR, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC660846

Hearing Date: February 13, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motionS to compel FURTHER discovery responses

Department #32 will be dark for motions on February 13, 2020.  Each party is ordered to email the Court’s clerk at SSCDept32@lacourt.org before 1:30 p.m. that day to inform the clerk whether you are submitting on the Court’s tentative or whether you are requesting a hearing.  If any party requests a hearing, one will be scheduled.  If you do not request a hearing or fail to email the Court’s clerk before 1:30 p.m. on the date of the hearing, you will waive the right to be heard and shall submit to this tentative order, which shall issue.

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendants Domingo Escobar and Smart & Final Stores, Inc. (“Defendants”) filed motions to compel further responses from AM Trust America, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) to Requests for Production, Numbers 1 through 23. Defendant Smart and Final, Inc. also seeks further responses to Requests for Admission, Numbers 1 through 4. Defendants seek sanctions against Plaintiff.

Defendants scheduled an informal discovery conference (“IDC”), as required by the Court’s standing order. Defendants’ counsel appeared, but Plaintiff’s counsel did not. Plaintiff also failed to oppose these motions. The motions are granted in their entirety. Plaintiff shall provide verified, code-compliant responses, without objections, within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. The Court finds that the failure to participate in the IDC and respond to the discovery requests appropriately is an abuse of the discovery process warranting sanctions. Therefore, the Court orders Plaintiff and its counsel-of-record to pay sanctions, jointly and severally, in the amount of $2,080, based upon ten hours of attorney time at a rate of $190 per hour plus three filing fees of $60 each. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: February 13, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC660846    Hearing Date: February 13, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

AM TRUST AMERICA, Inc.,

Plaintiff,

v.

DOMINGO ESCOBAR, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC660846

Hearing Date: February 13, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motionS to compel FURTHER discovery responses

Department #32 will be dark for motions on February 13, 2020.  Each party is ordered to email the Court’s clerk at SSCDept32@lacourt.org before 1:30 p.m. that day to inform the clerk whether you are submitting on the Court’s tentative or whether you are requesting a hearing.  If any party requests a hearing, one will be scheduled.  If you do not request a hearing or fail to email the Court’s clerk before 1:30 p.m. on the date of the hearing, you will waive the right to be heard and shall submit to this tentative order, which shall issue.

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendants Domingo Escobar and Smart & Final Stores, Inc. (“Defendants”) filed motions to compel further responses from AM Trust America, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) to Requests for Production, Numbers 1 through 23. Defendant Smart and Final, Inc. also seeks further responses to Requests for Admission, Numbers 1 through 4. Defendants seek sanctions against Plaintiff.

Defendants scheduled an informal discovery conference (“IDC”), as required by the Court’s standing order. Defendants’ counsel appeared, but Plaintiff’s counsel did not. Plaintiff also failed to oppose these motions. The motions are granted in their entirety. Plaintiff shall provide verified, code-compliant responses, without objections, within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. The Court finds that the failure to participate in the IDC and respond to the discovery requests appropriately is an abuse of the discovery process warranting sanctions. Therefore, the Court orders Plaintiff and its counsel-of-record to pay sanctions, jointly and severally, in the amount of $2,080, based upon ten hours of attorney time at a rate of $190 per hour plus three filing fees of $60 each. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: February 13, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court