This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 00:58:26 (UTC).

ALYSSA ORTIZ ET AL VS CHERYL CALDWELL ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by ALYSSA ORTIZ against CHERYL CALDWELL in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6844

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

HUMPHREYS VIRGINIA

CALDWELL CHERYL

Guardian Ad Litem

MAYORGA THOMAS

Minor

ORTIZ ALYSSA

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/30/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

SUMMONS

5/7/2018: SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/15/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/23/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/23/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/5/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Thomas Mayorga (Legacy Party); Alyssa Ortiz (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Cheryl Caldwell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Cheryl Caldwell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696844    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

ALYSSA ORTIZ,

Plaintiff,

v.

CHERYL CALDWELL,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC696844

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Thomas Mayorga (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Alyssa Ortiz (“Claimant”) and finds that the settlement is fair and reasonable. Petitioner has addressed the issues the Court previously identified with the petition. Accordingly, the Court is prepared to approve the settlement.

DATED: December 3, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC696844    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

ALYSSA ORTIZ,

Plaintiff,

v.

CHERYL CALDWELL,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC696844

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Thomas Mayorga (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Alyssa Ortiz (“Claimant”). The Court continues this hearing so Petitioner can address the following issues:

1. Petitioner has not included any evidence of Claimant’s medical bills, or the negotiated reductions thereto. The Court considers such evidence relevant to “the reasonableness of the compromise, covenant, settlement, or disposition.” (Cal. Rules of Court, 7.950.) Therefore, Petitioner should file a declaration with these documents as exhibits.

2. Petitioner has not submitted a copy of the retainer agreement with counsel. Therefore, Petitioner should file a declaration with this document as an exhibit.

3. Petitioner did not check Box #10 in the petition. Petitioner need not resubmit the petition. Instead, Petitioner may file a supplemental declaration containing this language.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Based upon the foregoing, the hearing on this petition is continued to December 3, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Petitioner shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 12, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court