This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:38:16 (UTC).

ALXANDER ARGUEDAS VS FCA US LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 ALXANDER ARGUEDAS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1438

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ARGUEDAS AXANDER

ARGUEDAS ALXANDER

Defendants and Respondents

YPD ALHAMBRA CJDR LLC

FCA US LLC

ALHAMBRA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

CHRYSLER MOTORS LLC

DOES 1 TO 20

YPD ALHAMBRA CJDR LLC DBA ALAHAMBRA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

DODGE ALHAMBRA CHRYSLER JEEP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NITA M. NICHOLAS ESQ.

NITA MARIAN NICHOLAS ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PROUDFOOT MATTHEW M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/2/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/6/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/6/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

2/20/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

2/20/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

2/22/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/28/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

2/28/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Minute Order

5/11/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/11/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

12/3/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Settlement

12/21/2018: Notice of Settlement

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

1/22/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration

1/22/2019: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/22/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Motion

1/22/2019: Notice of Motion

Minute Order

2/14/2019: Minute Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Hearing on ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Alxander Arguedas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Alxander Arguedas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Alxander Arguedas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Declaration (In Support of Plaintiff's Motion); Filed by Alxander Arguedas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alxander Arguedas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Alxander Arguedas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Alxander Arguedas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY WARRANTY ACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Alxander Arguedas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YPD ALHAMBRA CJDR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALHAMBRA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Chrysler Motors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant