This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 19:40:58 (UTC).

ALVIN BROWNLEE, ET AL. VS AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 ALVIN BROWNLEE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0258

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWNLEE ALVIN

BROWNLEE STEFHON

PORSHEA BRITNEE

BROWNLEE BRITTNEE PORSHEA

Defendants

AVALON WOODLAND HILLS LP

AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK RYAN GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/22/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/2/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • Hearing06/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Alvin Brownlee (Plaintiff); Stefhon Brownlee (Plaintiff); Brittnee Porshea Brownlee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alvin Brownlee (Plaintiff); Stefhon Brownlee (Plaintiff); Brittnee Porshea Brownlee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alvin Brownlee (Plaintiff); Stefhon Brownlee (Plaintiff); Britnee Porshea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alvin Brownlee (Plaintiff); Stefhon Brownlee (Plaintiff); Britnee Porshea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alvin Brownlee (Plaintiff); Stefhon Brownlee (Plaintiff); Britnee Porshea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVALON WOODLAND HILLS L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK RYAN