This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 18:40:28 (UTC).

ALVARO CARDENAS, ET AL. VS ERWING JAIRO MEDAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 ALVARO CARDENAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ERWING JAIRO MEDAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3418

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARDENAS ALVARO

Defendants

MEDAL ERWING JAIRO

MEDAL MOLINA ERWING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER J.

ZEESMAN DIANA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

7/9/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NATALIE

7/9/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NATALIE

PI General Order

7/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/23/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2024
  • Hearing06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Natalie); Filed by Alvaro Cardenas (Plaintiff); Alvaro Cardenas (Plaintiff); Natalie Sarabia, by and through GAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alvaro Cardenas (Plaintiff); Alvaro Cardenas (Plaintiff); Natalie Sarabia, by and through GAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alvaro Cardenas (Plaintiff); Alvaro Cardenas (Plaintiff); Natalie Sarabia, by and through GAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN DIANA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA