This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 21:06:46 (UTC).

ALVARADO KENT APARTMENTS LP, ET AL. VS LU WEI KING, MD

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 ALVARADO KENT APARTMENTS LP filed an Other lawsuit against LU WEI KING, MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0703

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALVARADO KENT APARTMENTS LP

SINGLE ROOM OCCUPANCY HOUSING CORPORATION

Defendant

KING LU WEI MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

Defendant Attorney

JIMENEZ ROY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO SET TRIAL DATE AND ADVANCE CMC; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/9/2021: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO SET TRIAL DATE AND ADVANCE CMC; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

7/16/2021: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Answer

6/15/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

6/4/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (LU WEI KING, MD)

6/4/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (LU WEI KING, MD)

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/4/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Hearing09/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other To Set a Trial Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMotion re: (to Set Trial Date and Advance CMC; Declarations in Support; and [Proposed] Order); Filed by Alvarado Kent Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by Alvarado Kent Apartments LP (Plaintiff); Single Room Occupancy Housing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lu Wei King, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alvarado Kent Apartments LP (Plaintiff); Single Room Occupancy Housing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Alvarado Kent Apartments LP (Plaintiff); Single Room Occupancy Housing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alvarado Kent Apartments LP (Plaintiff); Single Room Occupancy Housing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alvarado Kent Apartments LP (Plaintiff); Single Room Occupancy Housing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Lu Wei King, MD)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SINGLE ROOM OCCUPANCY HOUSING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JIMENEZ ROY JOSEPH