This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 19:53:26 (UTC).

ALVARADO HOSPITAL, LLC, ET AL. VS HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 ALVARADO HOSPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1345

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES GARDEN GROVE LLC DBA GARDEN GROVE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA LLC DBA LA PALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES SAN DIMAS LLC DBA SAN DIMAS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES-SHASTA LLC DBA SHASTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES III LLC DBA MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

ALVARADO HOSPITAL LLC DBA ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM LLC DBA WEST ANAHEIM MEDICAL CENTER

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES ENCINO LLC DBA ENCINO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES SHERMAN OAKS LLC DBA SHERMAN OAKS HOSPITAL

DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL INC. DBA DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL

Defendants

HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC.

OMNICARE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

AFFILIATED DOCTORS OF ORANGE COUNTY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP P.C.

LAKESIDE COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE INC.

GLOBAL CARE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC.

MULTICULTURAL MEDICAL GROUP INC.

HEALTH CARE LA IPA

PROSPECT MEDICAL GROUP INC.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOOCH DARON LAEL

Defendant Attorneys

HERNANDEZ KRISTA

JAZAERI BRIAN

SANDLER JONATHAN C.

HERNANDEZ KRISTA L.

JAZAERI BRIAN M.

MCCLELLAND MICHAEL D.

NAEVE WILLIAM D.

OUTWATER DAVID

ROMANO JENNIFER S.

WESTERFELD BRYAN S.

Other Attorneys

HAN KATHRYN TIANWEI

HAN KATHRYN T.

TOOCH DARON L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

7/28/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KATHRYN HAN ISO PLFS REPLY TO MOTION TO STAY

8/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KATHRYN HAN ISO PLFS REPLY TO MOTION TO STAY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE (FILED WITHOUT...)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE (FILED WITHOUT...)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/16/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATES

7/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATES

Case Management Statement

6/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/30/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Dismissal

4/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF MAY 6, 2020 CMC AND JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEF HEALTH NET'S RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

3/11/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF MAY 6, 2020 CMC AND JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEF HEALTH NET'S RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/21/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/21/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/21/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/11/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Post-Arbitration Status Conference); Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Healthcare Partners Medical Group, P.C. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike ((filed without reservation)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alvarado Hospital, LLC (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Centinela, LLC (Plaintiff); Desert Valley Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH CARE LA IPA is a litigant

Latest cases where OMNICARE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL is a litigant