This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 15:33:31 (UTC).

ALTURA CREDIT UNION VS YSSIS S MANYIKA

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 ALTURA CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YSSIS S MANYIKA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0171

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALTURA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

MANYIKA YSSIS S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH JENNIFER ARIN

1000 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457

KIM CHRISTIAN

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/5/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Substitution of Attorney

2/28/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Writ - Return

7/22/2020: Writ - Return

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

4/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

4/8/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Judgment

3/1/2019: Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/1/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Declaration - Declaration IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

2/4/2019: Declaration - Declaration IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - Declaration RE ALLOWING COPIES TO BE FILED IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS & ORDER THEREON

2/4/2019: Declaration - Declaration RE ALLOWING COPIES TO BE FILED IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS & ORDER THEREON

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

2/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 02/11/2019

2/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 02/11/2019

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/27/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint [Verified] for Money

11/27/2018: Complaint - Complaint [Verified] for Money

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/27/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/27/2018: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/27/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return; Filed by Sheriff/Police

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 03/01/2019 entered for Plaintiff Altura Credit Union against Defendant Yssis S Manyika, an individual.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT); Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (RE ALLOWING COPIES TO BE FILED IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS & ORDER THEREON); Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint ([Verified] for Money); Filed by Altura Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTURA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH JENNIFER A.