This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2023 at 18:19:35 (UTC).

ALTIMOND BRADBURY VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 ALTIMOND BRADBURY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2982

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADBURY ALTIMOND

Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYLACMTA

SHUKRI AGOP MARDEROS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONE-MOLLOY MICHAEL ALVES ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN MICHAEL GUY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/27/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/11/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

7/7/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , OR IN THE ALTERNATIV...)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , OR IN THE ALTERNATIV...)

Notice of Ruling

3/15/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARY ANN HAMPTON

12/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARY ANN HAMPTON

Separate Statement

12/10/2020: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIELA I. DYKES

12/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIELA I. DYKES

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/10/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Summary Judgment , Or In the Alternative Summary Adjudication of the Issues Against Plaintiff's Complaint (CCP 437c): Filed By: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY(LACMTA) (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ALTIMOND BRADBURY on 11/27/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY(LACMTA) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment , Or In the Alternativ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment , Or In the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Issues Against Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Defendant LACMTA scheduled for 03/15/2021 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 03/15/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Summary Judgment , Or In the Alternative Summary Adjudication of the Issues Against Plaintiff's Complaint (CCP 437c): Name Extension: , Or In the Alternative Summary Adjudication of the Issues Against Plaintiff's Complaint (CCP 437c); As To Parties changed from ALTIMOND BRADBURY (Plaintiff) to ALTIMOND BRADBURY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Michael Guy Martin, Esq. (Attorney): Organization Name changed from GRAVES & KING, LLP to Graves & King LLP; Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name changed from G. to Guy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ALTIMOND BRADBURY (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY(LACMTA) (Defendant); AGOP MARDEROS SHUKRI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 2 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ALTIMOND BRADBURY (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY(LACMTA) (Defendant); AGOP MARDEROS SHUKRI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ALTIMOND BRADBURY (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY(LACMTA) (Defendant); AGOP MARDEROS SHUKRI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******2982    Hearing Date: March 15, 2021    Dept: 29

Altimond Bradbury v. Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, et al.

Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication, filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority

TENTATIVE

Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority is GRANTED.

Legal Standard

The purpose of a motion for summary judgment “is to provide courts with a mechanism to cut through the parties’ pleadings in order to determine whether, despite their allegations, trial is in fact necessary to resolve their dispute.” (Aguilar v. Atl. Richfield Co. (2001) 25 Cal.4th 826, 843.) “Code of Civil Procedure section 437c, subdivision (c), requires the trial judge to grant summary judgment if all the evidence submitted, and ‘all inferences reasonably deducible from the evidence’ and uncontradicted by other inferences or evidence, show that there is no triable issue as to any material fact and that the moving party is entitled to judgment as a matter of law.” (Adler v. Manor Healthcare Corp. (1992) 7 Cal.App.4th 1110, 1119.)

“On a motion for summary judgment, the initial burden is always on the moving party to make a prima facie showing that there are no triable issues of material fact.” (Scalf v. D. B. Log Homes, Inc. (2005) 128 Cal.App.4th 1510, 1519.) A defendant moving for summary judgment “has met his or her burden of showing that a cause of action has no merit if the party has shown that one or more elements of the cause of action, even if not separately pleaded, cannot be established, or that there is complete defense to the cause of action.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 437c, subd. (p)(2).) “Once the defendant . . . has met that burden, the burden shifts to the plaintiff . . . to show that a triable issue of one or more material facts exists as to the cause of action or a defense thereto.” (Ibid.) “The plaintiff or cross-complainant shall not rely upon the allegations or denials of its pleadings to show that a triable issue of material fact exists but, instead, shall set forth the specific facts showing that a triable material fact exists as to the cause of action or a defense thereto.  (Ibid.) “If the plaintiff cannot do so, summary judgment should be granted.” (Avivi v. Centro Medico Urgente Med. Ctr. (2008) 159 Cal.App.4th 463, 467.)

“When deciding whether to grant summary judgment, the court must consider all of the evidence set forth in the papers (except evidence to which the court has sustained an objection), as well as all reasonable inferences that may be drawn from that evidence, in the light most favorable to the party opposing summary judgment.” (Avivi, supra, 159 Cal.App.4th at p. 467; see also Code Civ. Proc., ; 437c, subd. (c).)

Discussion

The Government Tort Claims Act

The intent behind the Tort Claims Act was “not to expand the rights of plaintiffs … against government entities, but to confine … government liability to rigidly delineated circumstances.” (Williams v. Hovarth (1975) 16 Cal.3d 834, 838.) As a result, a plaintiff must submit a claim to the public entity. In response to the plaintiff’s submission of the claim, the government entity must: (1) write to the plaintiff within 45 days of receipt of the claim for damages; (2) specify the date the claim was rejected; (3) warn of the six-month statute of limitations; and (4) serve the writing by personal service or by mail, to the address listed on the Claim for Damages. (Gov. Code, ;; 912.4, 912.6, 913, 945.4, and 945.6, subd. (a)(1).)

The statute of limitations period is triggered “from the date of the [Notice of Rejection] is deposited in the mail by the public entity, and not the date that it is received by the claimant or counsel.” (Edgington v. County of San Diego (1981) 225 Cal.App.3d 432, 440.)

Here, Moving Defendant asserts that Plaintiff timely submitted the Claim for Damages following the vehicle collision on January 31, 2018. (Undisputed Material Fact (“UMF”) No. 3; Hampton Decl., ¶ 7, Exh. A.) Seven days following the receipt of Plaintiff’s Claim for Damages, on February 6, 2018, Defendant mailed the Notice of Reject to Plaintiff at his listed address at 14137 S. Vermont Ave. #523, Gardena, CA 90247. (UMF Nos. 4-5; Hampton Decl., ¶ 9-11, Exhs. A-B.) The Notice of Reject clearly indicates on its face and warns Plaintiff of his six-month time limit by which he must commenced this action. (Exh. B.) From the date of the rejection notice, Plaintiff had until August 6, 2018 to commence this action. (UMF No. 6.) This action, however, was not commenced until November 27, 2019. (Dykes Decl., ¶ 2, Exh. A.) Plaintiff failed to timely file his complaint in this action. (UMF No. 7.) Based on these undisputed material facts, Moving Defendant met its burden of showing that there is a complete defense to the only cause of action, i.e., statute of limitations under the Government Torts Claims Act. As a result, the burden shifts to Plaintiff to show that a triable issue of one or more material facts exists as to the cause of action or a defense thereto. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 437c, subd. (p)(2).)

Since Plaintiff did not file his opposition to this motion, Plaintiff failed to meet his burden pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 437, subdivision (p)(2). Accordingly, the motion for summary judgment is GRANTED.

Conclusion

Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority’s Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED.

The action is DISMISSED in its entirety, without prejudice, as to Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority and its named defendant employee Agop Marderos Shukri.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.