This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:02:54 (UTC).

ALPHA ANALYTICS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC VS ROBERT KAHN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 ALPHA ANALYTICS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against ROBERT KAHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEIRDRE HILL and SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7674

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEIRDRE HILL

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

ALPHA ANALYTICS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DOES 1-20

KAHN ROBERT

ALPHA ANALYTICS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

GIPSON ROBERT E.

MCNALLY JACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Respondent, Cross Plaintiff, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SIDLE KENNETH I. ESQ.

GRAHAM CURTIS A. ESQ.

D'AMURA RICHARD A. ESQ.

D'AMURA RICHARD A.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

6/20/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

6/20/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

Minute Order

6/29/2018: Minute Order

AAIG AND GIPSON'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR RESCISSION

7/17/2018: AAIG AND GIPSON'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR RESCISSION

DEFENDANT ROBERT KAHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/20/2018: DEFENDANT ROBERT KAHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

8/20/2018: DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT ROBERT KAHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER; ETC

8/20/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT ROBERT KAHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANTS ALPHA ANALYTICS IN VESTMENT GROUP, LLC, ROBERT E. GIPSON, AND JACK MCNALLY TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINAN

9/5/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANTS ALPHA ANALYTICS IN VESTMENT GROUP, LLC, ROBERT E. GIPSON, AND JACK MCNALLY TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINAN

CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ROBERT KAHN'S DEMURRER

9/14/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ROBERT KAHN'S DEMURRER

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/9/2018: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice

11/26/2018: Notice

Minute Order

11/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/17/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

4/18/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

4/12/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/19/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

SUMMONS

3/12/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ON WRITTEN CONTRACT AND FOR AN ACCOUNTING

3/12/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ON WRITTEN CONTRACT AND FOR AN ACCOUNTING

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Re Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Re Dismissal) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Alpha Analytics Investment Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel ((Motion to Compel)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Motion of Defendant/Cross-C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice (of Settlement and Stipulation to Stay Action; and Order Thereon); Filed by Alpha Analytics Investment Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-04-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Alpha Analytics Investment Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ON WRITTEN CONTRACT AND FOR AN ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Alpha Analytics Investment Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIDLE KENNETH IRVING