This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2019 at 00:30:15 (UTC).

ALPHA ACTUAL, LLC, ET AL. VS CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 ALPHA ACTUAL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8041

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADJAMIAN ALLEN

ALPHA ACTUAL LLC

Defendant

CAL NET ENTERPRISES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/1/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/1/2019: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration

11/1/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Case Management Statement

11/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF VINCENT N. BARBERA

11/1/2019: Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF VINCENT N. BARBERA

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VINCENT N. BARBERA IN SUPPORT

11/1/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VINCENT N. BARBERA IN SUPPORT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/1/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/30/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/7/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/8/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • Hearing03/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Hearing03/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Hearing03/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Vincent N. Barbera); Filed by CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion (to Compel Arbitration); Filed by CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Vincent N. Barbera in Support); Filed by CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALPHA ACTUAL, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALPHA ACTUAL, LLC (Plaintiff); Allen Adjamian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL NET ENTERPRISE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN