This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 14:04:23 (UTC).

ALONDRA BOBADILLA VS MICHAEL R. SEGHI

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 ALONDRA BOBADILLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL R SEGHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0881

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOBADILLA ALONDRA

Defendant

SEGHI MICHAEL R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON MARK A.

Defendant Attorney

OLSON SONALI

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/31/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/31/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/27/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/8/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2025
  • Hearing10/31/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2023
  • Hearing12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Michael R. Seghi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Michael R. Seghi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alondra Bobadilla (Plaintiff); As to: Michael R. Seghi (Defendant); Service Date: 12/27/2022; Service Cost: 38.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/05/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/31/2025 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 12/27/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alondra Bobadilla (Plaintiff); As to: Michael R. Seghi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alondra Bobadilla (Plaintiff); As to: Michael R. Seghi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alondra Bobadilla (Plaintiff); As to: Michael R. Seghi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less