This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2022 at 12:01:32 (UTC).

ALMORQI, MOHAMMED VS ABUZAID, RAWAN ABDULLAH

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 ALMORQI, MOHAMMED filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ABUZAID, RAWAN ABDULLAH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SCULLY, ELIZABETH, NORD, SCOTT J., RICHARDSON, ANNE K., LEIS, COLIN P., IWASAKI, BRUCE G., RIFF, LAWRENCE P., KAUFMAN, SHELLEY, GOULD-SALTMAN, DIANNA, THOMAS, HOLLY A. and COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0906

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SCULLY, ELIZABETH

NORD, SCOTT J.

RICHARDSON, ANNE K.

LEIS, COLIN P.

IWASAKI, BRUCE G.

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

GOULD-SALTMAN, DIANNA

THOMAS, HOLLY A.

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALMORQI MOHAMMED

Respondent

ABUZAID RAWAN ABDULLAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

WEGNER TALITHA DAVIES

COHEN PHILIP KENT

GLUCKSMAN JACOB YALE

GROSS MARK PAUL

Respondent Attorney

MANSOURI PEDRAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/27/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

6/9/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Opposition - RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER

6/9/2022: Opposition - RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER

Minute Order

6/16/2022: Minute Order

Declaration - Declaration

6/2/2022: Declaration - Declaration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON WEGIS, CPA IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER???S RFO FOR TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT, CONTRI

6/2/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON WEGIS, CPA IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER???S RFO FOR TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT, CONTRI

Minute Order

6/3/2022: Minute Order

Trial Brief - PETITIONER???S TRIAL BRIEF RE RFO FOR TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT AND A CONTRIBUTION TO ATTORNEYS???

6/3/2022: Trial Brief - PETITIONER???S TRIAL BRIEF RE RFO FOR TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT AND A CONTRIBUTION TO ATTORNEYS???

Witness List - PETITIONER???S THIRD AMENDED WITNESS LIST RE RFO FOR TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT, PENDENTE LITE

5/31/2022: Witness List - PETITIONER???S THIRD AMENDED WITNESS LIST RE RFO FOR TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT, PENDENTE LITE

Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

11/29/2022: Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

Order - After Hearing

8/17/2022: Order - After Hearing

Order - After Hearing

8/17/2022: Order - After Hearing

Minute Order

8/2/2022: Minute Order

Reply - Reply

7/27/2022: Reply - Reply

Reply - Reply Declaration (Comment)

7/27/2022: Reply - Reply Declaration (Comment)

Opposition - Opposition

7/20/2022: Opposition - Opposition

Declaration - Declaration of Respondent (Declarations)

7/20/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Respondent (Declarations)

Declaration - Responsive Declaration of Pedram Mansouri, Esq., CLFS (Declarations)

7/20/2022: Declaration - Responsive Declaration of Pedram Mansouri, Esq., CLFS (Declarations)

240 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice - Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketOrder - After Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketOrder - After Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 35, Gould-Saltman, Dianna, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Ruling on Submitted Matter Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketReply (Reply Declaration (Comment) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketReply (Reply )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Respondent (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Responsive Declaration of Pedram Mansouri, Esq., CLFS (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
335 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2B, Thomas, Holly A., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Held - Order Made

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Application; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Yale Glucksman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEGNER TALITHA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSS MARK P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN PHILIP KENT