Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2020 at 19:58:46 (UTC).

ALMA ORTIZ-RAMIREZ VS BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 ALMA ORTIZ-RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2144

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ-RAMIREZ ALMA

Defendants

BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DOE AMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/25/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/25/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

9/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/22/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/24/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • Hearing08/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALMA ORTIZ-RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALMA ORTIZ-RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALMA ORTIZ-RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION is a litigant