This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 18:48:57 (UTC).

ALMA ORTIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS DL POULTRY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 ALMA ORTIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DL POULTRY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5334

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ AN INDIVIDUAL ALMA

Defendants

LIANG AN INDIVIDUAL DEBBIE HAI QING

DL POULTRY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LITWIN JOHN F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • Hearing03/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALMA ORTIZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALMA ORTIZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALMA ORTIZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less