This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 02:15:21 (UTC).

ALMA MOORE, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, ET AL. VS FH & HF-TORRANCE I, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 ALMA MOORE, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FH HF-TORRANCE I, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8234

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF RAYMOND STANLEY MOORE SR BY AND THROUGH ITS SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST ALMA MOORE

MOORE AN INDIVIDUAL ALMA

MOORE AN INDIVIDUAL LOLA

MOORE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST ALMA

MOORE-SULLIVAN AN INDIVIDUAL MONA

STANLEY MOORE RAYMOND JR. AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

FAMILY HEALTH & HOUSING FOUNDATION?TORRANCE I LLC

FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JARCHI ROBERT DANIEL

OSTEN AARON LOUIS

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPOULOS LYNNETTE AVANESS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

2/4/2022: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

Case Management Statement

2/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

1/10/2022: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/25/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT DEFENDANTS NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1441, 1442 AND 1446

10/28/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT DEFENDANTS NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1441, 1442 AND 1446

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/16/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 377.32 (MONA MOORE-SULLIVAN)

8/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 377.32 (MONA MOORE-SULLIVAN)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ALMA MOORE, Successor-in-Interest (Plaintiff); ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FH & HF-TORRANCE I, LLC (Defendant); FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION, a California Corporation (Defendant); FAMILY HEALTH & HOUSING FOUNDATION?TORRANCE I, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketMotion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by FH & HF-TORRANCE I, LLC (Defendant); FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION, a California Corporation (Defendant); FAMILY HEALTH & HOUSING FOUNDATION?TORRANCE I, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Court's Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by ALMA MOORE, Successor-in-Interest (Plaintiff); ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by ESTATE OF RAYMOND STANLEY MOORE SR, by and through its successors in interest Alma Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALMA MOORE, Successor-in-Interest (Plaintiff); ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALMA MOORE, Successor-in-Interest (Plaintiff); ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Successor In Interest Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 377.32 (Mona Moore-Sullivan)); Filed by ALMA MOORE, Successor-in-Interest (Plaintiff); ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Successor In Interest Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 377.32 (Alma Moore)); Filed by ALMA MOORE, Successor-in-Interest (Plaintiff); ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Successor In Interest Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 377.32 (Lola Moore)); Filed by ALMA MOORE, Successor-in-Interest (Plaintiff); ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALMA MOORE, Successor-in-Interest (Plaintiff); ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); MONA MOORE-SULLIVAN, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Successor In Interest Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 377.32 (Raymond Stanley Moore, Jr.)); Filed by ALMA MOORE, Successor-in-Interest (Plaintiff); ALMA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff); LOLA MOORE, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Moore is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPOULOS LYNNETTE AVANESS