This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 03:43:39 (UTC).

ALMA LOVE, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 ALMA LOVE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN I. JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0280

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOVE ALMA

LOVELACE GUNNAR

LANGTON ROBERT

BOATNER CAROL

WILLETT JOSEPHINE

ESAU'S COFFEE SHOP INC. DBA ESAU'S CAF

KOREN DAVID J.

AURIC ANNA

SCHILBRACK KAREN

KLINE RICHARD

RICARDS MARGERY ADELE

RICARDS LUCINDA CLAIRE

ADAMS DAN

ADAMS CARRIE

BARBETTI REBECCA

CRONIN MARIANNE

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Not Classified By Court

SALAMANCA NADIA

AURIC MATHEW

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADLER ENRIQUE ELLIOT

FOX DAVID ADAM

SIEGLOCK CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/28/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 06/10/2021

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 06/10/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:05 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 06/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alma Love (Plaintiff); Lilliana Morales (Plaintiff); Lucas Morales (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alma Love (Plaintiff); Lilliana Morales (Plaintiff); Lucas Morales (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND