This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2020 at 02:05:01 (UTC).

ALMA BUSTAMANTE VS HUGO ISMAEL GUTIERREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 ALMA BUSTAMANTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUGO ISMAEL GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0835

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BUSTAMANTE ALMA

Respondents and Defendants

GUTIERREZ HUGO ISMAEL

G&H X-PRESS INC

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SAADIAN BOBBY ESQ.

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

CULLINS & GRANDY LLP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

11/20/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

11/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

11/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

10/23/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/23/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

Proof of Personal Service

6/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

6/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/25/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/24/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/24/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATON IN SUPPORT

5/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATON IN SUPPORT

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/20/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - Notice of order Re: stipulation to continue trial

10/16/2018: Notice - Notice of order Re: stipulation to continue trial

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person -

10/3/2018: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENSE NEUROLOGICAL EXAMINATION (CCP ? 2032.640); ETC

5/1/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENSE NEUROLOGICAL EXAMINATION (CCP ? 2032.640); ETC

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alma Bustamante (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Hugo Ismael Gutierrez (Defendant); G&H X-Press, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Supplemental Request for Production); Filed by Hugo Ismael Gutierrez (Defendant); G&H X-Press, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Supplemental Interrogatories); Filed by Hugo Ismael Gutierrez (Defendant); G&H X-Press, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Responses to Supplemental Interrogatories); Filed by Hugo Ismael Gutierrez (Defendant); G&H X-Press, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Responses to Supplemental Request for Production); Filed by Hugo Ismael Gutierrez (Defendant); G&H X-Press, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Alma Bustamante (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Filed by Hugo Ismael Gutierrez (Defendant); G&H X-Press, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENSE NEUROLOGICAL EXAMINATION (CCP 2032.640); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hugo Ismael Gutierrez (Defendant); G&H X-Press, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Hugo Ismael Gutierrez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alma Bustamante (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0835    Hearing Date: November 20, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

alma bustamante,

Plaintiff,

v.

hugo ismael gutierrez, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****0835

Hearing Date: November 20, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to compel discovery responses

Defendants Hugo Ismael Gutierrez and G&H X-Press, Inc. (“Defendants”) move to compel responses from Plaintiff Alma Bustamante (“Plaintiff”) to: (1) Supplemental Request for Production of Documents, Set One (“SuppRPD”) and (2) Supplemental Interrogatories, Set One (“SuppROG”). The motions are granted.

Defendants served the discovery at issue on Plaintiff by mail on February 19, 2019. Defendants granted multiple extensions of time to respond, up to September 25, 2019. As of the filing date of these motions, Defendants have not received responses from Plaintiff. Plaintiff has not opposed the motion, and there is nothing in the record to suggest that Plaintiff has complied with her discovery obligations. Accordingly, the motions to compel responses to the SuppRPD and SuppROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendants’ motions to compel responses to the SuppRPD and SuppROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. Defendants are ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: November 20, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court