This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 14:25:58 (UTC).

ALLYSON J BROWN VS TONINA MALAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 ALLYSON J BROWN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TONINA MALAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0995

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BROWN ALLYSON J

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MALAN TONINA

SCANLAN JAMES JOSEPH

MALIAN TONINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS CAROLYN C

Defendant Attorney

WEEKS BRADLEY T

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/14/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Cross-Complaint

2/14/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/14/2022: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/27/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

4/11/2022: Answer

Notice of Continuance

4/15/2022: Notice of Continuance

Other Plaintiffs or Defendants - ANSWER

4/25/2022: Other Plaintiffs or Defendants - ANSWER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • Hearing04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketOther Plaintiffs or Defendants (Verification of her Answer to the Cross-Complaint of Tonina Malian); Filed by Allyson J Brown (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Tonina Malian Erroneously Sued As Tonina Malian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Allyson J Brown (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Tonina Malian Erroneously Sued As Tonina Malian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Tonina Malian Erroneously Sued As Tonina Malian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Tonina Malian Erroneously Sued As Tonina Malian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Allyson J Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Allyson J Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Allyson J Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Allyson J Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allyson J Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less