This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 07:13:26 (UTC).

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY VS LALA BOGHZI

Case Summary

On 11/16/2017 ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LALA BOGHZI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3810

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Respondents and Defendants

BOGHZI LALA

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

MENDELSON LEE M. ESQ.

MENDELSON LEE M.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

11/16/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

11/16/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

12/4/2017: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

12/27/2017: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

1/9/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

Order - Dismissal

5/16/2019: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL) OF 05/16/2019

5/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL) OF 05/16/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

5/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Other - - Proof of Service of Summons

10/10/2018: Other - - Proof of Service of Summons

Request for Dismissal

10/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))

11/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/21/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

10/21/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEE M MENDELSON

10/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEE M MENDELSON

Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/10/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Lee M Mendelson); Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMotion for Order (Vacating Entry of Dismissal); Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketOther - (Proof of Service of Summons); Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3810    Hearing Date: November 07, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

allstate insurance company,

Plaintiff,

v.

lala boghzi,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****3810

Hearing Date: November 7, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

plaintiff’s motion to set aside dismissal

Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) moves to set aside the Court’s order of May 16, 2019, in which the Court dismissed this action for failure to appear at trial. The court may “relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” The party must seek such relief “within a reasonable time, in no case exceeding six months, after the judgment, dismissal, order, or proceeding was taken.” (Code Civ. Proc. ; 473, subd. (b).) “[W]hen relief under section 473 is available, there is a strong public policy in favor of granting relief and allowing the requesting party his or her day in court.” (Rappleyea v. Campbell (1994) 8 Cal.4th 975, 981-982, internal quotations omitted.)

Here, Plaintiff has advanced a declaration from its counsel, Lee M. Mendelson (“Counsel”). Counsel states that he failed to appear at the hearing due to a calendaring error. This constitutes good cause, and Defendant does not oppose the motion. Therefore, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The motion to set aside default is granted. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: October 13, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: October 28, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 7, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL