This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 15:31:32 (UTC).

ALLISON CHERRY VS BO LI

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 ALLISON CHERRY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BO LI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, STEPHEN M. MOLONEY and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8193

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHERRY ALLISON

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

LI BO

CERNO DOROTHY

CERNO FRANK

CERNO BENINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

OZOWARA BEVERLY

OZOWARA BEVERLY A.

FRY GARRETT R

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

ZEGEL JOHN E.

PARK BROOKE Y.

LUBSY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S BO LI'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/5/2020: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S BO LI'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 02/06/2020

2/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 02/06/2020

Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

1/8/2020: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF GARRETT FRY IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/17/2020: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF GARRETT FRY IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BROOKE PARK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

12/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BROOKE PARK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

11/20/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT BO LI'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING T...)

11/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT BO LI'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING T...)

Motion to Consolidate

11/12/2019: Motion to Consolidate

Notice of Related Case

10/18/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

11/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

Demand for Jury Trial

10/9/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/9/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

4/17/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Substitution of Attorney

1/4/2019: Substitution of Attorney

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Perso

12/3/2018: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Perso

SUMMONS -

7/12/2017: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

7/12/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Allison Cherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Benina Cerno (Defendant); Frank Cerno (Defendant); Dorothy Cerno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docketat 3:19 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Allison Cherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 02/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketReply (defendant's Bo Li's reply to plaintiff's opposition to motion for leave to file cross-complaint); Filed by Bo Li (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4, Stephen M. Moloney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (1st stip cont trl 4 mos. FSC 12-26-18 to 4-24-19; Trl 1-14-19 t 5-13-19); Filed by Bo Li (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bo Li (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Allison Cherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allison Cherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allison Cherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC668193    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 4A

Motion to Consolidate

Having considered the moving papers, opposition and reply, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On December 17, 2018, Plaintiff Allison Cherry, (“Cherry”) filed a complaint (case no. BC668193) against Defendants Bo Li (“Li”) and DOES 1 to 20 for motor vehicle negligence arising from an automobile collision that occurred on November 1, 2016. On December 17, 2018, Cherry also filed a complaint against Defendants Benina Cerno, Frank Cerno, Dorothy Cerno (collectively, “Cerno Defendants”) and DOES 1 to 20 for motor vehicle negligence arising from an automobile collision that occurred on November 1, 2018.

On October 18, 2019, Cherry filed a notice of related cases. On November 1, 2019, the court deemed case nos. BC668193 and 18STCV08717 to be related, and the cases were assigned to Department 4A.

On November 12, 2019, Cherry filed the instant motion to consolidate. On December 2, 2019, Defendant Bo Li (“Li”) filed an opposition. On December 6, 2019, Cherry filed a reply.

Trial is set for June 17, 2020 for case no. BC668193. Trial is set for June 15, 2020 for case no. 18STCV08717.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Plaintiff Cherry requests a court order consolidating the two cases, BC668193 and 18STCV08717, for trial. 

LEGAL STANDARD

Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subd. (a)(1)(C) states that a notice of motion to consolidate must “be filed in each case sought to be consolidated.” (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subd. (a)(1)(C).)

DISCUSSION

Here, a notice of motion to consolidate has been filed in case no. BC668193 but has not filed in case no. 18STCV08717. As noted, Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subd. (a)(1)(C) requires that a notice of motion to consolidate must be filed in each case sought to be consolidated.

Accordingly, the Motion to Consolidate is DENIED. If Cherry seeks to pursue her desire to consolidate these cases, she must file the notice of motion and moving papers not only in the lead case, numbered BC668193, but also in the related case numbered 18STCV08717, pursuant to CRC Rule 3.350(a)(1)(C).

Cherry is ordered to give notice of this Court’s ruling.