This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2020 at 12:45:05 (UTC).

ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORP VS SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0258

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORP

Defendants

207 SEASIDE PARTNERS LLC

SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION INC.

COMERICA BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PICOZZI ED

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/21/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

7/27/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

8/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 08/04/2020

8/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 08/04/2020

Request for Dismissal

8/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Allied Subcontractors Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 08/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Allied Subcontractors Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Allied Subcontractors Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Allied Subcontractors Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Allied Subcontractors Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allied Subcontractors Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 207 SEASIDE PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Comerica Bank is a litigant