Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 12:27:23 (UTC).

ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC. VS BENCHMARK CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 ALLIED ROOFING WATERPROOFING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BENCHMARK CONTRACTORS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2052

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC.

Defendants

BENCHMARK CONTRACTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEB STEVEN S

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/12/2020: Request for Dismissal

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

1/6/2020: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/6/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

1/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN EWART IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

1/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN EWART IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/25/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/26/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Justin Ewart in Support of Application for Right to Attach Order); Filed by ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order); Filed by ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BENCHMARK CONTRACTORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOEB, STEVEN S