Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 03:45:35 (UTC).

ALLIED ROOFING AND WATERPROOFING, INC. VS GHBW, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 ALLIED ROOFING AND WATERPROOFING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GHBW, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0326

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIED ROOFING AND WATERPROOFING INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GHBW A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

RIVHOUSE NO.5 LLC. A MICHIGAN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KEN KAMBA ELECTRIC INC.

SMITH BROS. INC.

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING WLA INC.

EXPERT PLUMBING INC.

SMITH BROS INC.

HACKETT GEOFFREY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

SMITH BROS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEB STEVEN S

Defendant Attorneys

ROZANSKY NICHOLAS

STANTON MITCHEL

DORENFELD DAVID KEITH

RIGGEN SAMANTHA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

6/2/2021: Notice of Related Case

Answer

6/2/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 06/03/2021

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 06/03/2021

Answer

5/19/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

5/19/2021: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

5/24/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/24/2021: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

5/6/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

4/6/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/6/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

3/10/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Hearing08/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 1:50 PM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Related Cases) of 06/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KEN KAMBA ELECTRIC, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by KEN KAMBA ELECTRIC, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Smith Bros., Inc. (Defendant); Smith Bros, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Smith Bros, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Smith Bros, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITH BROS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GHBW A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant