Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 18:40:48 (UTC).

ALLIED ROOFING AND WATERPROOFING, INC. VS GHBW, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 ALLIED ROOFING AND WATERPROOFING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GHBW, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0323

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIED ROOFING AND WATERPROOFING INC.

Defendants

SCHWARTZBERG JAIME KRAT

GHBW A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

SCHWARTZBERG ANDREW NATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEB STEVEN S

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Lis Pendens

3/10/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allied Roofing and Waterproofing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GHBW A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOEB, STEVEN S