This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 10:04:09 (UTC).

ALLIANT GP 40, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS LN REALTY, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 ALLIANT GP 40, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against LN REALTY, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0487

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLIANT GP 40 LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ALLIANT GP 42 LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

HUNT CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LN REALTY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CYPERS MICHAEL L.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

11/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALLIANT GP 40, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff); ALLIANT GP 42, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALLIANT GP 40, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff); ALLIANT GP 42, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALLIANT GP 40, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff); ALLIANT GP 42, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALLIANT GP 40, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff); ALLIANT GP 42, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALLIANT GP 40, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff); ALLIANT GP 42, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALLIANT GP 40, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff); ALLIANT GP 42, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less