This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 03:06:36 (UTC).

ALLIANT CREDIT UNION, AN ILLINOIS STATE CHARTERED CREDIT UNION VS KATHY MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 ALLIANT CREDIT UNION, AN ILLINOIS STATE CHARTERED CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KATHY MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0668

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANT CREDIT UNION AN ILLINOIS STATE CHARTERED CREDIT UNION

Defendants

MARTINEZ AN INDIVIDUAL FABIAN

MARTINEZ AN INDIVIDUAL KATHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

10/21/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRE-TRIAL WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/21/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRE-TRIAL WRIT OF POSSESSION

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

10/21/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department C at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Hearing on Motion - Other notice of application and hearing for claim and delivery (ccp 512.030)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery); Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Pre-Trial Writ of Possession); Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D