This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 04:33:59 (UTC).

ALLIANT CREDIT UNION, AN ILLINOIS STATE CHARTERED CREDIT UNION VS DON R. KLABUNDE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 ALLIANT CREDIT UNION, AN ILLINOIS STATE CHARTERED CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DON R KLABUNDE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1070

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANT CREDIT UNION AN ILLINOIS STATE CHARTERED CREDIT UNION

Defendants

KLABUNDE AN INDIVIDUAL SHIRL

KLABUNDE DON R. AKA DON KLABUNDE AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM MICHAEL DONALD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/21/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/21/2022

3/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/21/2022

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

1/25/2022: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/25/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

1/25/2022: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/30/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • Hearing08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, John J. Kralik, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docketat 09:59 AM in Department B, John J. Kralik, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery); Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alliant Credit Union, an Illinois State Chartered Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D