This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2022 at 08:26:33 (UTC).

ALLIANT CAPITAL LTD., A FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL. VS SANTORO HOLDINGS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 ALLIANT CAPITAL LTD , A FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SANTORO HOLDINGS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2485

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADC COMMUNITIES II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ALLIANT CAPITAL LTD. A FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

BLACK SWAN PROPERTIES LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CAROLINE SMITH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE CS ADMINISTRATIVE TRUST UNDER THE SANTORO FAMILY TRUST

CRAIG THOMAS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE CARPE VITAM REVOCABLE TRUST

SANTORO HOLDINGS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CYPERS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/20/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ALLIANT CAPITAL LTD., a Florida limited partnership (Plaintiff); ADC COMMUNITIES II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: SANTORO HOLDINGS LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BLACK SWAN PROPERTIES LLC, a Washington limited liability company (Defendant); CAROLINE SMITH, individually and as trustee of the CS Administrative Trust under the Santoro Family Trust dated September 29, 2010 (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ALLIANT CAPITAL LTD., a Florida limited partnership (Plaintiff); ADC COMMUNITIES II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: SANTORO HOLDINGS LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BLACK SWAN PROPERTIES LLC, a Washington limited liability company (Defendant); CAROLINE SMITH, individually and as trustee of the CS Administrative Trust under the Santoro Family Trust dated September 29, 2010 (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ALLIANT CAPITAL LTD., a Florida limited partnership (Plaintiff); ADC COMMUNITIES II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: SANTORO HOLDINGS LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BLACK SWAN PROPERTIES LLC, a Washington limited liability company (Defendant); CAROLINE SMITH, individually and as trustee of the CS Administrative Trust under the Santoro Family Trust dated September 29, 2010 (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less