Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2021 at 04:14:39 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE VS AY'S AUTO COLLISION, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE filed an Other lawsuit against AY'S AUTO COLLISION, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5509

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE

Defendant

AY'S AUTO COLLISION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALDEZ LARRY T.

Other Attorneys

VALDEZ LARRY ALLEN TIRADOR

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT

4/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT

Order

4/9/2021: Order

Case Management Statement

3/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

3/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/25/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Settlement

4/1/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/30/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (FOR SETTLEMENT); Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected); Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alliance United Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AY'S AUTO COLLISION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALDEZ LARRY ALLEN TIRADOR