This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 20:31:41 (UTC).

ALLEN COLPITT, ET AL. VS AT&T CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 ALLEN COLPITT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AT T CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3056

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLPITT ALLEN

COLPITT JUANITA

Defendants

AT&T CORP.

CRANE CO.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HOPEMAN BROTHERS INC.

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION FKA THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY

INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY

JOHN CRANE INC.

METALCLAD INSULATION LLC

MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AND SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION FKA ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC. FKA LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO WESTERN ELECTRIC COMPANY INC.

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL FKA VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

SOCO WEST INC.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN BENJAMIN DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

CAPPY ROD

CARPENTER ERIN M.

CROSS E. RENO

DUFFY JOSEPH

ELDREDGE JONATHAN A.

MCMEEL MEGHAN R.

MILBRODT JEREMY D.

POND ESQ FRANK D

SCHEFFY MIRNA J.

BERGSTROM EMILY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER, MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/3/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER, MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

5/4/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

5/4/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Allen Colpitt (Plaintiff); Juanita Colpitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDefendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; Filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by Morse Tec LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by Metalclad Insulation LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by Metalclad Insulation LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Allen Colpitt (Plaintiff); Juanita Colpitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDefendant Genuine Parts Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; Filed by Genuine Parts Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDefendant Genuine Parts Company's Demand for Jury Trial and Estimate of Length of Trial; Filed by Allen Colpitt (Plaintiff); Juanita Colpitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Allen Colpitt (Plaintiff); Juanita Colpitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allen Colpitt (Plaintiff); Juanita Colpitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Allen Colpitt (Plaintiff); Juanita Colpitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Allen Colpitt (Plaintiff); Juanita Colpitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORGWARNER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOPEMAN BROTHERS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SOCO WEST INC. is a litigant