This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2021 at 02:44:59 (UTC).

ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED, A CORPORATION VS WILLIAN EDUARDO ANDRADE MERINO

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAN EDUARDO ANDRADE MERINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0865

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED A CORPORATION

Defendant

ANDRADE MERINO WILLIAN EDUARDO AKA WILLIAN E. ANDRADE MERINO AKA WILLIAN MERINO DBA JUNIOR?S MERINO TOWING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIDER PORTER MARTINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/10/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

10/5/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allegiant Partners Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIDER PORTER MARTINA