Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 08:00:43 (UTC).

ALLAN VINCENT CERAVOLO ET AL VS CHRISTOPHER STEVEN MARKS

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 ALLAN VINCENT CERAVOLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER STEVEN MARKS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6410

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CERAVOLO ANA

CERAVOLO ALLAN VINCENT

Defendants and Respondents

BUDGET TRUCK RENTAL LLC

DOES 1 TO 20

MARKS CHRISTOPHER STEVEN

GE CAPITAL COMMERCIAL SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MARTINIAN TIGRAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MOLLOY CHRISTIAN DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Unknown

6/26/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

6/26/2017: SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/13/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/13/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER STEVEN MARKS

6/28/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER STEVEN MARKS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/17/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Motion in Limine

5/16/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/16/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/16/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/16/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/16/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/16/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/16/2019: Motion in Limine

Minute Order

5/20/2019: Minute Order

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an order shortening time and to immediately hear its motion to continue trial, final status conference, and pretrial dates and deadlines including regarding regular discovery and expert discovery) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND TO IMMEDIATELY HEAR ITS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES INCLUDING REGARDING REGULAR DISCOVERY AND EXPERT DISCOVERY); Filed by Ana Ceravolo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order shortening time ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Opposition (Defts non opposition to ex parte t o cont trial); Filed by Christopher Steven Marks (Defendant); Budget Truck Rental LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Motion in Limine (Motion In Limine No. 1); Filed by Budget Truck Rental LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 9); Filed by Budget Truck Rental LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 8); Filed by Budget Truck Rental LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 7); Filed by Budget Truck Rental LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 6); Filed by Budget Truck Rental LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 5); Filed by Budget Truck Rental LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Allan Vincent Ceravolo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Budget Truck Rental LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Budget Truck Rental LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Allan Vincent Ceravolo (Plaintiff); Ana Ceravolo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC666410    Hearing Date: December 15, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

allen vincent ceravolo, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

christopher steVen marks, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC666410

Hearing Date: December 15, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to compel deposition

Plaintiffs Allen Ceravolo and Ana Ceravolo (“Plaintiffs”) move to compel Defendant Christopher Steven Marks (“Defendant”) to appear for deposition. Plaintiffs have the right to take Defendant’s deposition and are entitled to take Defendant’s deposition without leave of court.  (See Code Civ. Proc., § 2025.210, subd. (a).) There appears to be no dispute that the deposition must be taken, so the motion is granted. Plaintiff seeks sanctions in connection with the motion. The Court finds that Defendant bears responsibility for this scheduling dispute, constituting an abuse of the discovery process warranting sanctions. Therefore, the Court orders Defendant (but not Defendant’s counsel) to pay sanctions in the amount of $960, which the Court finds to be fair and reasonable under the circumstances.

The deposition shall occur within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. The deposition shall be conducted remotely, during normal business hours, and on on a court day unless the parties stipulate to different parameters. Plaintiffs shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 15, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUDGET TRUCK RENTAL LLC is a litigant