This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 09:45:52 (UTC).

ALLAN J. WILLIAMS II VS LULULEMON USA INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 ALLAN J WILLIAMS II filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LULULEMON USA INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5711

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS II ALLAN J.

Defendant

LULULEMON USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL

Defendant Attorney

LIAO KATHARINE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

8/13/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

7/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/14/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

11/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/2/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Hearing01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lululemon USA Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lululemon USA Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Allan J. Williams II (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Allan J. Williams II (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Allan J. Williams II (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allan J. Williams II (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Allan J. Williams II (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******5711 Hearing Date: June 8, 2022 Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ALLAN J. WILLIAMS II,

Plaintiff,

vs.

LULULEMON USA INC., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: *******5711

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION

Date: 8:30 a.m.

Time: June 8, 2022

Department: 56

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Lululemon USA Inc.

Defendant’s Application of Laura Lawless to be admitted pro hac vice (the “Application”) complies with the requirements of California Rules of Court, rule 9.40, except insofar as the Proof of Service of the Application does not indicate that the State Bar of California was served therewith at its San Francisco Office, as required by that rule, although the Application states that the required fee was paid to the State Bar. The Court has considered the Application. No opposition papers were filed. Any opposition papers were required to have been filed and served at least nine court days prior to the hearing under California Code of Civil Procedure section 1005, subdivision (b). If Moving Party submits a Proof of Service at or before the time of the hearing showing that the State Bar of California was served at the time of the filing of the Application, the Court will GRANT the Application under Sexton v. Superior Court (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 1403, 1410. If no such Proof of Service is filed by the time of the hearing, the Application will be DENIED without prejudice.

Moving party is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

In consideration of the current COVID-19 pandemic situation, the Court strongly encourages that appearances on all proceedings, including this one, be made by LACourtConnect if the parties do not submit on the tentative. If you instead intend to make an appearance in person at Court on this matter, you must send an email by 2 p.m. on the last Court day before the scheduled date of the hearing to SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org stating your intention to appear in person. The Court will then inform you by close of business that day of the time your hearing will be held. The time set for the hearing may be at any time during that scheduled hearing day, or it may be necessary to schedule the hearing for another date if the Court is unable to accommodate all personal appearances set on that date. This rule is necessary to ensure that adequate precautions can be taken for proper social distancing. Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 8th day of June 2022

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where lululemon usa inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIAO KATHARINE JOAN