This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 17:19:49 (UTC).

ALLAN J. MCLAREN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 ALLAN J MCLAREN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1284

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCLAREN AN INDIVIDUAL ALLAN J.

MCLAREN ALLAN J.

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/30/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/7/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • Hearing12/01/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Hearing12/01/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Allan J. McLaren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Allan J. McLaren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Allan J. McLaren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Allan J. McLaren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YANG MICHELLE