This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2019 at 02:20:09 (UTC).

ALL STAR DIRECTORIES INC VS PCS LINK INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 ALL STAR DIRECTORIES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PCS LINK INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6553

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALL STAR DIRECTORIES INC

Defendants and Respondents

FDBA GREENWOOD HALL

DOES 1 TO 20

PCS LINK INC

HALL FDBA GREENWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOLDMAN MARTIN F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

9/19/2018: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/11/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CASE SUMMARY AND STATEMENT OF FACTS INTEREST CALCULATIONS PURSUANT TO CRC SECTION 3.1800

1/11/2018: CASE SUMMARY AND STATEMENT OF FACTS INTEREST CALCULATIONS PURSUANT TO CRC SECTION 3.1800

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

1/11/2018: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT

1/11/2018: JUDGMENT

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

1/11/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order

1/11/2018: Minute Order

APPL. FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT/POSSESSION/SALE OF EXEC. AND ORDER

1/16/2018: APPL. FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT/POSSESSION/SALE OF EXEC. AND ORDER

Minute Order

10/25/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/26/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

SUMMONS

6/27/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY

6/27/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/6/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/15/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

8/15/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/3/2017: Unknown

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • APPL. FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT/POSSESSION/SALE OF EXEC. AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; (Order to Show Cause; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by All Star Directories, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Request; Filed by All Star Directories, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Default Judgment; Filed by All Star Directories, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by All Star Directories, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Notice; Filed by All Star Directories, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by All Star Directories, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCS Link, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDMAN MARTIN F