This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 21:24:47 (UTC).

ALL IN PICTURES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS NO WAY JOSE PRODUCTIONS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 ALL IN PICTURES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NO WAY JOSE PRODUCTIONS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6620

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL IN PICTURES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

GOLDBERG ADAM

NO WAY JOSE PRODUCTIONS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RING ROBERT ALAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/3/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 08/30/2021

8/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 08/30/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

8/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

8/23/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

10/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 08/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by All In Pictures, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by All In Pictures, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by All In Pictures, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by All In Pictures, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ring, Robert A