Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 01:37:04 (UTC).

ALISON BURNETT VS LEGENDS HOSPITALITY, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 ALISON BURNETT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LEGENDS HOSPITALITY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1453

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURNETT ALISON

Defendant

LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESSRELIAN HAROUT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alison Burnett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (of entire action); Filed by Alison Burnett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge) of 08/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Alison Burnett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Alison Burnett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alison Burnett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alison Burnett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alison Burnett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant