This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 11:11:15 (UTC).

ALISA SINANIAN VS CESAR MARVIN HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 ALISA SINANIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CESAR MARVIN HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0604

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINANIAN ALISA

Defendant

HERNANDEZ CESAR MARVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELIKYAN GEVORG

Defendant Attorney

TOROSYAN ANDREA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/28/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/28/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/3/2019: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/31/2019: Answer

Request for Dismissal

1/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alisa Sinanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cesar Marvin Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alisa Sinanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alisa Sinanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alisa Sinanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alisa Sinanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alisa Sinanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOROSYAN ANDREA