This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 03:55:34 (UTC).

ALIREZA RAJAIEH VS AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSING & DISTRIBUTION PARTNERS, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 ALIREZA RAJAIEH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSING DISTRIBUTION PARTNERS, L P , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0254

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAJAIEH ALIREZA

Defendants

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSING & DISTRIBUTION PARTNERS L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIPS PAUL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/07/2021

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/7/2020: Complaint - COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • Hearing05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 04/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alireza Rajaieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alireza Rajaieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint (with Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by Alireza Rajaieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN LOGISTIC INT'L WAREHOUSING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHILIPS PAUL