This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 02:14:28 (UTC).

ALIREZA ATAEI, ET AL. VS JAVIER SANCHEZ REYES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 ALIREZA ATAEI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAVIER SANCHEZ REYES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3761

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ATAEI ALIREZA

MENDOZA JOSE

Defendants

SANCHEZ REYES LUIS OMAR

REYES JAVIER SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK CAMERON Y.

Defendant Attorney

BUI TATIANA YOKOYAMA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/27/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

7/15/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2024
  • Hearing04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Javier Sanchez Reyes (Defendant); Luis Omar Sanchez Reyes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alireza Ataei (Plaintiff); Jose Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alireza Ataei (Plaintiff); Jose Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alireza Ataei (Plaintiff); Jose Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUI TATIANA YOKOYAMA