This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2022 at 11:58:30 (UTC).

ALINA KUCHINA VS ABYLAY ZHAKASHOV

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 ALINA KUCHINA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABYLAY ZHAKASHOV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1474

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUCHINA ALINA

Defendant

ZHAKASHOV ABYLAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINK ROBERT S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

5/25/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Association of Attorney

3/9/2022: Association of Attorney

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/7/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

2/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

2/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/30/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/30/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/7/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer - ANSWER TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/13/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2019: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

4/11/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/4/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Alina Kuchina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Alina Kuchina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF RULING GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL); Filed by Abylay Zhakashov (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Alina Kuchina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alina Kuchina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer (TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT); Filed by Abylay Zhakashov (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alina Kuchina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alina Kuchina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alina Kuchina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1474 Hearing Date: February 1, 2022 Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties are encouraged to meet and confer concerning this tentative ruling to determine if a resolution may be reached. If the parties are unable to reach a resolution and a party intends to submit on this tentative ruling, the party must send an email to the Court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating that party’s intention to submit. The email shall include the case number, date and time of the hearing, counsel’s contact information (if applicable), and the identity of the party submitting on this tentative ruling. If the Court does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on this tentative ruling and there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may place the motion off calendar. If all parties do not submit on this tentative ruling, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely (which is highly encouraged). Further, after the Court has posted/issued a tentative ruling, the Court has the inherent authority to prohibit the withdrawal of the subject motion and adopt the tentative ruling as the order of the Court.

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

February 1, 2022

CASE NUMBER

*******1474

MOTION

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

MOVING PARTY

Tamar G. Arminak

OPPOSING PARTY

None

MOTION

Tamar G. Arminak of Arminak Law APC (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Abylay Zhakashov.

ANALYSIS

Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for the motion is a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. This is a valid reason for withdrawal. (See Rules Prof. Conduct, rule 1.16.) Accordingly, the Court grants the motion.

Counsel must serve the signed order (form MC-053), which shall include information about all future hearings and proceedings noticed by any party, or ordered by the Court, on Defendant and all other parties who have appeared in the action, within 10 days of the date of this Order, and file a proof of service of such. Counsel will remain the attorney of record for Defendant until Counsel files the requisite proof of service. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(e).)



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINK ROBERT S.