This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2022 at 11:35:52 (UTC).

ALICIA LAWRENCE, ET AL. VS GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 ALICIA LAWRENCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0313

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAWRENCE ALICIA

MEINHART BERNARD

BOYNES-BROWN TINA

BECKER BLAIR C.

Defendants

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

MCKESSON CORPORATION

CHATTEM INC.

RITE AID CORPORATION

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORPORATION INC.

NOVITIUM PHARMA LLC

SANOFI US SERVICES INC.

WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC.

KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL

WOCKHARDT LTD.

SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC

RANBAXY INC.

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK LLC

GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAREKH BEHRAM VIRAF

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Related Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Related Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/23/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 07/27/2021

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 07/27/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2021

9/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2021

Notice of Ruling

8/11/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF ADDITION OF CASE TO JCCP 5150

10/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ADDITION OF CASE TO JCCP 5150

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY CASE HAS NOT BEEN ADDED ON TO JCC...)

11/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY CASE HAS NOT BEEN ADDED ON TO JCC...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY CASE HAS NOT BEEN ADDED ON TO JCC...) OF 11/29/2021

11/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY CASE HAS NOT BEEN ADDED ON TO JCC...) OF 11/29/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Case has not been Added on to JCCP5150) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Case has not been Added on to JCC...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why Case has not been Added on to JCC...) of 11/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Addition Of Case To JCCP 5150); Filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant); Rite Aid Corporation (Defendant); Walgreen Co. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:40 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Alicia Lawrence (Plaintiff); Blair C. Becker (Plaintiff); Jeanne Kelly-Pile (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 1:34 PM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 07/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Alicia Lawrence (Plaintiff); Blair C. Becker (Plaintiff); Jeanne Kelly-Pile (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Alicia Lawrence (Plaintiff); Blair C. Becker (Plaintiff); Jeanne Kelly-Pile (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alicia Lawrence (Plaintiff); Blair C. Becker (Plaintiff); Jeanne Kelly-Pile (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alicia Lawrence (Plaintiff); Blair C. Becker (Plaintiff); Jeanne Kelly-Pile (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Novitium Pharma LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORPORATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wockhardt Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. is a litigant