This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 16:33:34 (UTC).

ALICE SJOFJAN, ET AL. VS TARA GARCIA

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 ALICE SJOFJAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TARA GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6906

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OTERA LISA

SJOFJAN ALICE

Defendants

GARCIA TARA

SINGH DIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE ANGELA S.

Defendant Attorney

MCCLENDON NYKEEMAH

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/21/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/30/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/28/2021: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

9/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

8/11/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Summons - SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/1/2021: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2024
  • Hearing07/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Diana Singh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Diana Singh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alice Sjofjan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Alice Sjofjan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Alice Sjofjan (Plaintiff); Lisa Otera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alice Sjofjan (Plaintiff); Lisa Otera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Alice Sjofjan (Plaintiff); Lisa Otera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alice Sjofjan (Plaintiff); Lisa Otera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alice Sjofjan (Plaintiff); Lisa Otera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alice Sjofjan (Plaintiff); Lisa Otera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE ANGELA S.