This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 00:25:43 (UTC).

ALICE M. ROMERO VS LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 ALICE M ROMERO filed an Other lawsuit against LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1560

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMERO ALICE M.

Defendants

LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC

JADEITE MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

MCVAY DEAN H

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

2/10/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

2/11/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL

2/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL

Opposition - OPPOSITION [DEFENDANTS] TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

2/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION [DEFENDANTS] TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

Opposition - OPPOSITION [DEFENDANTS] TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT LA MIRADA HE

2/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION [DEFENDANTS] TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT LA MIRADA HE

Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC

2/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (C/F 12/29/20 DARK); HEARING ON MO...)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (C/F 12/29/20 DARK); HEARING ON MO...)

Notice of Ruling

1/5/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/5/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order - ORDER RULING

1/5/2021: Order - ORDER RULING

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: CHRISTINE KWON-CHANG/ #12143

11/9/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: CHRISTINE KWON-CHANG/ #12143

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING MOTION...)

11/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING MOTION...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

11/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

11/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Notice of Ruling

11/13/2020: Notice of Ruling

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 11:23 AM in Department 49; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL); Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOpposition ([DEFENDANTS?] TO PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC); Filed by LA Mirada Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Jadeite Management, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOpposition ([DEFENDANTS?] TO PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DEAN H. MCVAY IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by LA Mirada Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Jadeite Management, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF DEFENDANTS? EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC); Filed by LA Mirada Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Jadeite Management, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMotion for Trial Preference; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alice M. Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1560    Hearing Date: January 05, 2021    Dept: 49

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Alice M. Romero,

Plaintiff,

Case No.

*******1560

v.

[Tentative] Ruling

La Mirada Healthcare, LLC, et al.

Defendants.

Hearing Date: January 5, 2021

Department 49, Judge Stuart M. Rice

(1) Plaintiff’s Motion for Trial Preference

Moving Parties: Plaintiff Alice M. Romero

Responding Party: Defendants La Mirada Healthcare, LLC and Jadeite Management, LLC

Ruling: Plaintiff’s motion for trial preference is granted subject to COVID restrictions.

Under Code Civ. Proc. ; 36, subdivision (a), a party to a civil action who is over 70 years of age is entitled to trial preference if the party has a substantial interest in the action as a whole and the health of the party is such that a preference is necessary to prevent prejudicing the party’s interest in the litigation. An attorney’s declaration is sufficient to establish the medical diagnosis and prognosis of the party seeking trial preference under section 36, subdivision (a). (Code Civ. Proc. ; 36.5.) 

The parties do not dispute that Plaintiff is 84 years old. (Attarchi Decl. ¶ 8.) With regard to the health prong of section 36, subdivision (a), Attarchi’s declaration is a sufficient basis upon which the Court may properly find that Plaintiff’s health is such that preference is necessary to prevent prejudicing the party’s interest in the litigation. Attarchi states Plaintiff’s various afflictions in detail, and declares that

Alice Romero is an 82 year old woman with a medical history of CVA with left sided weakness, left shoulder fracture, dementia, vision loss, history of multiple falls, history of two left hip fractures, history of diabetes atrial fibrillation, hypertension, necrotizing pancreatitis, severe muscle weakness, abscess of the left kidney causing acute renal failure, intra-abdominal abscess from ruptured intestine, multiple respiratory failures requiring at least four intubations, pleural effusion, GERD, and anemia.

(Id.)

Attarchi’s declaration further details each identified affliction and concludes that “to a reasonable degree of medical certainty there exists a substantial medical doubt that Ms. Romero has more than six months to live.” (Id. ¶ 10.)

Defendants argue that Plaintiff has failed to show good cause, but do not attack any of the information provided by Plaintiff’s declaring physician. Defendant merely asserts that “a moving party must present an adequate proffer of specific facts giving rise to ‘good cause’ for relief.” (Opp. 5:8-10.) As set forth above, Plaintiff has provided sufficient facts to make the requisite showing.

Defendants also make an argument that granting trial preference would violate Defendant’s due process rights “because Defendants would be unable to prepare and organize their case in such a short time frame,” and “Defendants would also be denied their statutory right to file motions for summary judgment.” (Opp. 7:17-20.) However, the granting of this motion would set trial at the latest for May 4, 2021 and adequate time remains for filing a motion for summary judgment, if appropriate. Defendants do not substantiate an argument that setting a trial date as required by CCP 36(a) would be violative of their due process rights. The difficulty in preparing a case for trial in such a short time frame is acknowledged but does not compel a different ruling.

Plaintiff’s motion for trial preference is granted subject to COVID restrictions. The specific date for trial shall be determined at the hearing on this matter.

Date: January 5, 2021

Honorable Stuart M. Rice

Judge of the Superior Court